TEMPORARYCONTEMPORARY STUDIOS

Charity number: 1123395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/05/2016 01/05/2017 01/05/2018 01/05/2019 01/05/2020
Total gross income £500 £50 £500 £300 £35
Total expenditure £0 £0 £350 £39 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A