BRITISH ARAB RESOURCE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Westminster
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 20 December 2007: Standard registration
- 09 February 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.74k | £63.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.50k | £62.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES 3 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF ARAB INDIVIDUALS AND PEOPLE OF ARAB DESCENT (CHILDREN, ADULTS AND ELDERLY PERSONS) LIVING IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA, IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS CHARITABLE IN LAW AS THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES (ALSO KNOWN AS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE) SHALL DECIDE, IN PARTICULAR BY: = THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND CULTURE; = BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES [NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY] FOR EDUCATION AND WELLBEING. = THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND ADVOCACY TO PERSONS WHO, THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE. = THE PROVISION OF RECREATION AND OR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. = THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND EDUCATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. = SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO OTHER ARAB GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR SIMILAR PURPOSES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window