Trustees THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF EDUCATIONAL ASSESSORS
Charity number: 1122014
Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Ward | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dame Kathryn August | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Gunn | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil King | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicola Crossley | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Jenkins-Handy | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tim Sherriff | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Thomas-Coxhead | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lumby | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOANNA GOODMAN | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.