Trustees GATWICK DETAINEES WELFARE GROUP

Charity number: 1124328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Moffat Chair 04 December 2021
None on record
THOMAS HACKETT Trustee 15 November 2022
None on record
Adrian Radford Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Henry Crossley Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Michael Heathcote Trustee 03 June 2021
ECONE
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ARUNDEL MUSEUM
Received: On time
ST FRANCIS LEPROSY GUILD
Received: On time
Pious Prosper Keku Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Michael Frederick Berkeley Trustee 12 January 2019
None on record
Alan Gregory Clough Trustee 12 January 2019
None on record
FELICITY DICK MBE Trustee
None on record