Financial history OCTOPUS COMMUNITY NETWORK

Charity number: 1128394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £406.60k £396.61k £323.91k £476.94k £436.25k
Total expenditure £410.68k £400.88k £271.42k £399.17k £408.30k
Income from government contracts N/A £8.47k £30.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £63.24k £35.00k £79.97k £127.44k