THE MIDDLE ORCHARD TRUST

Charity number: 1121900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 10 December 2018 08 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 10 December 2017 15 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 10 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 10 December 2015 22 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 December 2015 Not Required