FAITH TRUTH & HOPE

Charity number: 1121897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £533.16k £386.57k £739.17k £580.32k £607.92k
Total expenditure £518.29k £415.14k £520.28k £798.17k £555.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £533.16k N/A £739.17k £580.32k £607.92k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £518.29k N/A £520.28k £798.17k £555.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £1.38k £2.17k £2.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £553.82k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0