WOOTTON AND DRY SANDFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1121899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 10 January 2017 On time Download