WOOTTON AND DRY SANDFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1121899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Joyce Rayner Trustee 08 August 2019 None on record
Karen Mary Fysh Chair 04 July 2014 None on record
Paula Cantwell Trustee 05 July 2018 None on record
Roger Adrian Bucknell Trustee 06 October 2016 None on record
Sally Nichols Trustee 07 March 2019 None on record
Maureen Catherine Susan Alder Trustee 07 April 2016 None on record
Janet Scott Trustee 21 May 2020 None on record
Brian Miller Trustee 21 May 2020 None on record
Edward Carter Trustee 07 February 2019 None on record
Sue Rayner Trustee 14 March 2019 None on record