ARCHAEOLOGY & DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 November 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 November 2017 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 04 October 2016 On time Download