ARCHAEOLOGY & DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £95.89k £195.54k £118.37k £140.92k £188.17k
Total expenditure £133.79k £176.83k £97.87k £114.07k £150.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A