SOMALILAND WOMEN & CHILDREN'S GROUP, LIVERPOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a range of educational, leisure and recreational activities for Somali women and children in Liverpool. These range from trips to museums, parks, the seaside, holiday activities for children and sports and arts activities. With new Somali families settling in Liverpool, and most families living in households where no-one works, we try to ensure a good quality of life for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 05 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASIA HASSAN | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amina Ibrahim Mohamoud | Trustee | 15 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Asia Shareef Abdalla | Trustee | 15 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sahra Hussien Egeh | Trustee | 15 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Fatima Dahir Aden | Trustee | 15 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2024 | 371 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 February 2024 | 736 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED (DATED) 25TH APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
FOR SOMALI WOMEN, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, LIVING OR RESIDENT IN LIVERPOOL, ENGLAND ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, POLITICAL, OR OTHER OPINION 1)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, REPRESENTATION, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATING AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN SUCH MATTERS AS ASYLUM, IMMIGRATION, MONEY, DEBTS, HOUSING, WELFARE BENEFITS AND HEALTH; 2) THE PROMOTION OF THEIR EDUCATION, TRAINING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT; 3)THE PROVISION OF MOTHER TONGUE AND ESOL, IT, CULTURE, COOKERY AND OTHER VOCATIONAL SUBJECTS; 4)THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
LIVERPOOL ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 SELBORNE STREET
LIVERPOOL
L8 1YQ
- Phone:
- 01517070132
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window