Accounts and annual returns FOSCOLO APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 1123769
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required