Accounts and annual returns TWEYAMBE SELF START COMMUNITY ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1122267
Charity reporting is overdue by 1627 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 166 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 166 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 531 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 531 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 896 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 896 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1261 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1261 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1627 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1627 days