TWEYAMBE SELF START COMMUNITY ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1122267
Charity reporting is overdue by 864 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0