CHANCE TO SHINE FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1123385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anshu Jain Trustee 14 October 2015 None on record
Kriti Sharma Trustee 30 April 2018 None on record
Sophie O'Connor Trustee 15 September 2015
MALARIA NO MORE UNITED KINGDOM Received: On time
Charlotte Edwards Trustee 04 September 2014 None on record
Sir Daniel Grian Alexander Trustee 15 September 2015 None on record
CASPAR ROCK Trustee 04 September 2014 None on record
Douglas Peter McAllister Trustee 21 April 2015 None on record
Sir DONALD HOOD BRYDON Chair 04 September 2014
FOUNDATION FOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY Received: On time
Alison Oliver Trustee 30 September 2016 None on record
MARTIN DARLOW Trustee 30 September 2016
CAPITAL KIDS CRICKET Received: On time
William Lawes Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record