THE FRIENDS OF BENTLEY ST PAUL'S C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1122208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.09k £3.13k £6.82k £9.77k £6.02k
Total expenditure £3.86k £4.64k £6.50k £3.32k £5.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A