NEW WORLD INTERNATIONAL (UK)

Charity number: 1126542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 February 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 October 2018 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 March 2017 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required