MAGICAL MOMENTS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1122943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £223.13k £216.90k £218.29k £238.62k £236.33k
Total expenditure £212.71k £216.69k £225.33k £212.56k £207.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £127.84k N/A N/A