Trustees DURRELL WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST - UK

Charity number: 1121989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Cook Trustee 23 September 2022
INSTITUTE FOR EMPLOYMENT STUDIES
Received: On time
Gerald Voisin Trustee 07 July 2021
None on record
Sam Barty-King Trustee 28 May 2020
None on record
Mark Burges-Watson Trustee 28 May 2020
None on record
SIMON TONGE Trustee 26 November 2019
None on record
Nicole- Louise Langlois Trustee 28 March 2019
None on record