BILLERICAY PARENTS FORUM
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Billericay Parents Forum offers support to parents and carers of children and young people in the local area. We promote positive parenting methods and aim to provide opportunities for everyone to share experiences through our courses, activities and membership which are open to all families and interested organisations in our community.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2016
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Essex
Llywodraethu
- 05 Rhagfyr 2016: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1161075 PARENTS 1ST SOUTH ESSEX
- 11 Chwefror 2008: Cofrestrwyd
- 05 Rhagfyr 2016: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £29.85k | £21.04k | £5.94k | £2.72k | £1.77k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £23.95k | £19.38k | £10.41k | £10.60k | £9.23k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 07 Tachwedd 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 07 Medi 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 17 Hydref 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 03 Hydref 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED 28 JANUARY 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE BASILDON DISTRICT, PRIMARILY IN THE BILLERICAY AREA, BY PROMOTING POSITIVE PARENTING SKILLS AND DEVELOPING FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS WHICH WILL BENEFIT THE CARE, EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING AFFORDABLE TRAINING TO IMPROVE PARENTING SKILLS; B) ORGANISING EVENTS AND LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES WHICH ARE INCLUSIVE TO EVERYONE IN THE AREA AND PROVIDE LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES RELATING TO POSITIVE PARENTING; C) PROVIDING AND SHARING INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO PARENTS AND SERVICES WHICH ARE INVOLVED WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE'S CARE, EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
BASILDON DISTRICT, PRIMARILY IN THE BILLERICAY AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window