THE ACCESS TO SPORTS PROJECT

Charity number: 1122243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £885.59k £739.14k £779.54k £757.45k £887.65k
Total expenditure £887.74k £766.11k £852.13k £803.61k £727.61k
Income from government contracts £481.25k £459.37k £193.44k £169.23k £207.81k
Income from government grants £3.00k £10.96k £283.61k £279.91k £316.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £34.87k £12.36k £19.86k £19.33k £38.79k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £850.33k £726.55k £759.51k £737.70k £848.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £392 £229 £172 £416 £513
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £860.40k £738.61k £824.45k £778.61k £702.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds £27.33k £27.50k £27.68k £25.00k £25.00k
Expenditure - Governance £60.68k £44.61k £44.01k £36.87k £42.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0