COMUNIDADE EVANGELICA SARA NOSSA TERRA

Charity number: 1122255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £25.30k £21.43k £13.36k £9.76k £9.39k
Total expenditure £25.25k £21.39k £15.15k £6.07k £10.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A