ELLERT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1122169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.05k £3.67k £5.19k £4.96k £2.92k
Total expenditure £34.65k £47.60k £47.41k £33.85k £56.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A