THE SOCIETY FOR RADIOLOGICAL PROTECTION

Charity number: 1122804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £350.25k £467.48k £425.55k £414.89k £463.68k
Total expenditure £379.99k £473.47k £434.04k £424.03k £439.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A