Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR RADIOLOGICAL PROTECTION
Charity number: 1122804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER KAY HUMPHRIES | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gary Mark Teague | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Graham | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Alison Joan Holburt | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephanie Emma Bloomer | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Reay | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Lockyer | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr John David Harrison | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lucas | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Martin Ahmet | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CHARLES FREDERIC THURSTON | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HUNAK | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MORGAN-BROWN | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER ALAN PERKS | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH ALLAN | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.