ASIA PACIFIC CHILDRENS FUND

Charity number: 1126009
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £592.71k £693.33k £810.14k £826.55k £857.74k
Total expenditure £582.61k £692.11k £810.96k £824.73k £847.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £592.71k £582.24k £810.14k £697.45k £857.74k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £129.09k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £582.61k £692.11k £810.96k £824.73k £847.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0