HACKNEY MIGRANT CENTRE

Charity number: 1122363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 February 2019 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 December 2016 On time Download