ST SIDWELL'S CENTRE, EXETER

Charity number: 1122697
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 February 2019 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 February 2019 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 February 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 February 2018 27 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 February 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 01 February 2017 1 days late Download