ST SIDWELL'S CENTRE, EXETER

Charity number: 1122697
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £171.01k £220.04k £193.42k £344.38k £256.83k
Total expenditure £178.76k £210.19k £209.26k £302.08k £280.32k
Income from government contracts £1.60k £0 N/A £66.72k £72.50k
Income from government grants £37.54k £10.00k £23.80k £38.62k £8.50k