ST SIDWELL'S CENTRE, EXETER

Charity number: 1122697

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Keith Gordon Bell Trustee 13 December 2019 None on record
Dr SUAAD GENEM Trustee None on record
Dr Celia Plender Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Rosemary Hanvey Trustee 01 October 2020
TOPSHAM MUSEUM Received: On time
MARTIN JOHN WEILER Trustee None on record
Richard Allen Westlake Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
SARAH PORTER Trustee 01 December 2014 None on record
Alex Hibberd Trustee 04 February 2021 None on record
MARCUS GARDNER Trustee 01 December 2014 None on record