SHASSAB SEERAT-UN-NABI WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1123798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.52k £3.78k £8.64k £9.08k £16.58k
Total expenditure £3.94k £11.92k £5.81k £11.91k £5.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A