Financial history FRIENDS OF NORFOLK COUNTY YOUTH ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1123478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.55k £9.64k £11.57k £55.38k £7.02k
Total expenditure £6.75k £6.37k £19.15k £24.82k £7.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A