BNOS AGUDAS YISROEL

Charity number: 1123216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £74.62k £60.74k £87.55k £84.56k £109.48k
Total expenditure £82.54k £98.48k £106.07k £110.43k £138.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A