STARS CHILDREN'S BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1122625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £86.82k £168.44k £171.85k £110.02k £138.20k
Total expenditure £82.47k £127.94k £150.82k £130.02k £120.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.66k £50.66k N/A N/A £1.34k