Accounts and annual returns THE ALFRETON PARTY IN THE PARK

Charity number: 1125758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 February 2022 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 February 2022 480 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 November 2018 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1607 days