SHINE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1122828
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £74.73k £92.42k £92.10k £82.32k £84.52k
Total expenditure £58.30k £88.74k £82.32k £55.69k £63.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A