Trustees AFFIRMING CATHOLICISM

Charity number: 1122906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Christopher Parkes Chair 07 November 2022
None on record
Susan Patterson Trustee 11 February 2024
None on record
Arthur Henry William Rea Trustee 11 February 2024
None on record
Rev Danny Lee Pegg Trustee 07 November 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WILLINGDON
Received: On time
THE TREES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Revd Canon Mark Newby Haworth Trustee 15 February 2021
None on record
Dr Charlie Bell Trustee 15 February 2021
None on record
Rev Jonathan Niall Agnew MacNeaney Trustee 09 November 2019
None on record
Rev Hannah Felicity Cleugh Trustee 17 December 2015
None on record
REV PROF CHARLOTTE MARY METHUEN Trustee
THE ECCLESIASTICAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF SAINT WILLIBRORD
Received: On time
ALAN DAVEY Trustee
FRIMLEY AND CAMBERLEY CADET CORPS AND MAPLE LEAF CLUB
Received: On time