BAPS CHARITIES

Charity number: 1123367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £122.52k £151.62k £114.08k £79.61k £79.61k
Total expenditure £628.46k £81.47k £113.95k £88.08k £88.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A