KAMYABI

Charity number: 1125243
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £5.52k £2.90k £9.05k £3.14k £14.06k
Total expenditure £5.52k £11.99k £8.93k £3.18k £28.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A