THE OREN AND RACHEL PELEG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 August 2020 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 August 2020 45 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 August 2018 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 01 August 2018 32 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 September 2017 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required