THE OREN AND RACHEL PELEG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £10.00k £78.75k £0 £50.00k £0
Total expenditure £11.01k £20.79k £13.12k £35.57k £7.37k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A