CROSSROADS OF LIFE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1125352
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.75k £30.35k £22.16k £14.00k £16.26k
Total expenditure £8.86k £31.72k £21.11k £14.27k £14.67k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A