FRIENDS OF CHERNOBYL'S CHILDREN (HELPSTON AND DISTRICT)

Charity number: 1122824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £31.86k £27.65k £27.46k £32.71k £12.60k
Total expenditure £27.36k £28.88k £34.88k £24.63k £10.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A