MAGIC CARPET (EXETER)

Charity number: 1122778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £91.44k £112.16k £79.31k £88.33k £155.35k
Total expenditure £95.37k £94.64k £92.61k £98.47k £101.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £1.50k £1.50k £1.50k £2.81k