THE DREAM FACTORY

Charity number: 1123662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve the suffering of children and young people aged from 3 years to 25 years, living in the UK, with life limiting or terminal illnesses and/or severe disabilities, by granting wishes and dreams in order to bring happiness and joy, for example: toys and games, meeting a famous person, trip or party.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £225,185
Total expenditure: £245,071

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 April 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AMANDA JANE GALANOPOULOS Chair 21 May 2018
None on record
Annabel Lawrenson Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
Thomas Burton Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
Joshua Mills Trustee 22 January 2024
None on record
Mitchell Goldie Trustee 15 January 2024
None on record
Sarah Woodley-Dyne Trustee 11 December 2023
None on record
LYNDA JOYCE CLARKE Trustee 01 April 2008
None on record
AVRIL MILLS BEM Trustee 01 April 2008
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £105.43k £102.45k £188.96k £180.19k £225.19k
Total expenditure £134.40k £106.92k £140.72k £181.37k £245.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £29.21k £3.29k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
South Eastern Electrical Plc
Unit 1/A
62-70 Fowler Road
Hainault Business Park
Ilford
IG6 3UT
Phone:
07712619726