Financial history THE MATTHEW PROJECT

Charity number: 1122801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.14m £2.08m £2.22m £2.11m £2.20m
Total expenditure £3.63m £2.04m £1.93m £2.00m £2.21m
Income from government contracts £810.00k £810.00k £810.00k £810.00k £766.36k
Income from government grants N/A £48.54k £119.45k £74.54k £175.48k
Income - Donations and legacies £36.13k £185.24k £414.05k £127.68k £73.72k
Income - Other trading activities £6.28k £0 £6.21k £25.42k £67.99k
Income - Charitable activities £4.09m £1.89m £1.80m £1.96m £2.05m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £728 £0 £2.42k £254 £67
Income - Other £8.95k £6.69k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £135.78k £28.17k £183 £6.68k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.63m £2.04m £1.93m £2.00m £2.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.50k £3.42k £3.39k £3.19k £6.85k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £47.83k £19.07k £12.57k £10.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0