Financial history LONDON CITY FARMS AND COMMUNITY GARDENS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1123264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £10.76k £15.76k £13.89k £10.44k £13.65k
Total expenditure £8.94k £12.21k £13.38k £1.50k £14.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A