POSITIVE YOUTH FOR THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1122881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 January 2020 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 January 2020 718 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 January 2020 1083 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required