SHREE SHREE LOKNATH BHAKTA PORISHAD (UK)

Charity number: 1124272
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.64k £7.75k £10.45k £10.14k £11.20k
Total expenditure £10.68k £9.21k £11.57k £13.32k £10.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A